WV SB323 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 66, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 66, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Correcting statute subsection designations regarding trespassing on property
Title
Correcting statute subsection designations regarding trespassing on property
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] |
Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Bob Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 459) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 458) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 407) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 23) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 23) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 7) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 458) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 407) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 23) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 23) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 7) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 66, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 407) |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2016-01-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-01-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 7) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2016-01-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4126 (Similar To) 2016-01-20 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 3B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |