WV SB319 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing individuals who completed home schooling be eligible for PROMISE scholarship without equivalent diploma
Title
Allowing individuals who completed home schooling be eligible for PROMISE scholarship without equivalent diploma
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 374) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 374) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 342) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 341) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 152) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 374) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 342) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 341) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 152) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/14/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/18 |
2018-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 374) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 374) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 342) |
2018-03-06 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 341) |
2018-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-02 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2018-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-02-21 | House | To House Education |
2018-02-21 | House | To Education then Finance |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 152) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2018-02-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2018-01-18 | Senate | To Education |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-18 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18C | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |