WV SB3036 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supplementing and amending appropriations to DHS, Division of Justice and Community Services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplementing and amending appropriations to DHS, Division of Justice and Community Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15SenateReferred to Rules on 2nd reading
2021-10-14SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 10/14/21
2021-10-14SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-10-13SenateRead 1st time
2021-10-13SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2021-10-13SenateImmediate consideration
2021-10-13SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-10-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB336 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Chapter 1, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback