WV SB3034 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Chapter 37, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Chapter 37, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Dividing state into senatorial districts
Title
Dividing state into senatorial districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 62) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 62) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 840) (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 839) (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 838) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 49) (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 49) (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 48) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 48) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 47) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Amendment as amended rejected (Roll No. 46) (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Takubo amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 45) (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-10-20 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 62) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 840) (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 839) (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 838) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 49) (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 49) (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 48) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 48) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 47) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Amendment as amended rejected (Roll No. 46) (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Takubo amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 45) (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | Chapter 37, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 10/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 10/22/21 |
2021-10-20 | House | Approved by Governor 10/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-10-20 | Senate | To Governor 10/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-10-20 | House | To Governor 10/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-10-22 | Senate | To Governor 10-22-21 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 62) |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 62) |
2021-10-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-10-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-10-20 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 840) |
2021-10-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 839) |
2021-10-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-20 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-10-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 838) |
2021-10-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-10-20 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-10-20 | House | Reference dispensed |
2021-10-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 49) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 49) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 48) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 48) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 47) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Unanimous consent to amend |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 10/18/21 |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Amendment as amended rejected (Roll No. 46) |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Takubo amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 45) |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Rucker floor amendment reported |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 10/15/21 with right to amend |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 10/14/21 with right to amend |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 10/13/21 with right to amend |
2021-10-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Originating in Senate Redistricting |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 2 | 1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |