WV SB3025 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Chapter 33, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Chapter 33, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating generally to WV ABLE Act
Title
Relating generally to WV ABLE Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-15 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 37) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 812) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 811) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 27) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 37) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 812) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 811) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 27) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | Chapter 33, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 10-22-21 - Senate Journal |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 10-22-21 |
2021-10-20 | House | Approved by Governor 10/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-10-20 | House | To Governor 10/19/21 - House Journal |
2021-10-19 | Senate | To Governor 10/19/21 |
2021-10-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 37) |
2021-10-15 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-10-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-10-14 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 812) |
2021-10-14 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-10-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 811) |
2021-10-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-14 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763) |
2021-10-14 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-10-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-10-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-10-13 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-10-13 | House | Reference dispensed |
2021-10-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 27) |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB328 (Similar To) 2021-10-20 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 48 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 48 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 48 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |