WV SB302 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 208, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 208, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add WVMPFRS to the definition of "retirement plan" as it relates to disqualification for public retirement plan benefits; and to specify that TRS participants who elected to transfer from the TDC Plan (
Title
Relating to state retirement plans
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 129) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 128) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 128) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 208, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-05 | House | Approved by Governor 3/3/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/3/15 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/3/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-02-27 | Senate | To Governor 2/27/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 129) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 128) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-18 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-16 | House | To Finance |
2015-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | To Pensions |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-26 | Senate | To Pensions then Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2560 (Same As) 2015-02-06 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 10A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |