WV SB289 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB289

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 348, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creating Green Alert Plan

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Green Alert Plan

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 476) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 523) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 522) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-14SenateChapter 348, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/24/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-24SenateApproved by Governor 3/24/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/24/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/17/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/17/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-17SenateTo Governor 3/17/20
2020-03-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-06SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-06SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 476)
2020-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-04HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-04HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-04HousePassed House (Roll No. 523)
2020-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-04HouseDispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 522)
2020-03-04HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-04HouseFrom House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar
2020-03-03HouseFrom Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-03-02HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-29HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-29HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-28HouseWith amendment, do pass
2020-02-27HouseTo House Finance
2020-02-27HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2020-01-28HouseTo House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
2020-01-28HouseTo Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Finance
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-27SenateOrdered to House
2020-01-27SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 26)
2020-01-27SenateRead 3rd time
2020-01-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-01-24SenateRead 2nd time
2020-01-24SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-01-23SenateRead 1st time
2020-01-23SenateOn 1st reading
2020-01-22Senate2nd reference dispensed
2020-01-22SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2020-01-10SenateTo Military
2020-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-10SenateTo Military then Finance
2020-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB289 (Carry Over) 2019-01-14 - To Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
153E1New CodeSee Bill Text
153E2New CodeSee Bill Text
153E3New CodeSee Bill Text
153E4New CodeSee Bill Text
153E5New CodeSee Bill Text
153E6New CodeSee Bill Text
153E7New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback