WV SB286 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 123, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 123, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide medical and religious exemptions from mandatory immunizations for school children. The bill would require parents and guardians to assert their religious beliefs in an affidavit. Parents or guardians seeking an exemption for a child would be required to present an affidavit to be provided to the Department of Health and Human Resources, before the exemption could apply. Further, the bill would remove students who are not immunized from school in times of emergency or epidemics. The bill provides that the Secretary of Health and Human Resources may by legislative rule add or delete diseases for which vaccines are required for school attendance and reconstitutes the Immunization Advisory Committee.
Title
Relating to compulsory immunizations of students; exemptions
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Daniel Hall [D] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Kent Leonhardt [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Mullins [R] |
Sen. Robert Karnes [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 641) (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 1) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House receded and passed (Roll No. 633) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 569) (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 532) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 1) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House receded and passed (Roll No. 633) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 569) (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 532) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 123, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-18 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-18 | House | Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 641) |
2015-03-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) |
2015-03-18 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2015-03-18 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 1) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2015-03-18 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/17/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/15 |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | House receded and passed (Roll No. 633) |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 569) |
2015-03-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-13 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 532) |
2015-03-13 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2015-03-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-27 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2015-02-18 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senator Maynard requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senator Walters requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Senator M. Hall requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2015-01-23 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-23 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2556 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 3 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 3 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |