WV SB285 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Extending time frame for WV practitioners write prescriptions on tamper-resistant paper
Title
Extending time frame practitioners must write prescriptions on official tamper-resistant paper
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Mike Hall [R] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] |
Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Gregory Tucker [D] |
Sen. Mark Wills [D] | Sen. Jack Yost [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 138, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/24/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-24 | To Governor 3/24/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/24/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-12 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 42) | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 356) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-11 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | With amendment, do pass | |
2011-03-04 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-03-04 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2011-03-03 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House | |
2011-03-02 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-02 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) | |
2011-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-01 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-28 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-28 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-25 | Reported do pass | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Judiciary | |
2011-01-26 | Motion | |
2011-01-26 | Reported do pass | |
2011-01-26 | Originating in Senate Health and Human Resources |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5W | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |