WV SB27 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Approved by Governor 2/27/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Removing restrictions on where certain traditional lottery games may be played

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing restrictions on where certain traditional lottery games may be played

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 80) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 59) (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseApproved by Governor 2/27/19 - House Journal
2019-02-27SenateApproved by Governor 2/27/19
2019-02-21HouseTo Governor 2/21/19 - House Journal
2019-02-21SenateTo Governor 2/21/19
2019-02-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-02-05SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-02-05SenateCommunicated to House
2019-02-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 80)
2019-02-05SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-01HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-01HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-01HousePassed House (Roll No. 59)
2019-02-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-01HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-31HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-01-31HouseRead 2nd time
2019-01-31HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-30HouseRead 1st time
2019-01-30HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-29HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-01-17HouseTo House Finance
2019-01-17HouseTo Finance
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-16SenateOrdered to House
2019-01-16SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 3)
2019-01-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-01-16SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-01-15SenateRead 2nd time
2019-01-15SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-14SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-14SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-11SenateReported do pass
2019-01-09SenateTo Finance
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateTo Finance
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2184 (Similar To) 2019-01-14 - To House Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29229Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback