WV SB268 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating requirement that certain agencies purchase commodities produced on institutional farms
Title
Eliminating requirement that certain agencies purchase commodities produced on institutional farms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 56) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-02-05 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 56) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-01-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2018-01-12 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-12 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development then Finance |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4143 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
HB4338 (Similar To) 2018-04-16 - Chapter 107, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
HB4338 (Similar To) 2018-04-16 - Chapter 107, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 12A | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |