WV SB262 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 48, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 48, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to move the Children's Health Insurance Program ("CHIP") from the Department of Administration to the Department of Health and Human Resources.
Title
Transferring CHIP and Children's Health Insurance Agency from Department of Administration to DHHR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 102) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 48, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | House | Approved by Governor 2/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/25/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-02-25 | House | To Governor 2/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-02-25 | Senate | To Governor 2/25/15 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-18 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-02-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 102) |
2015-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-13 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-11 | House | To House Government Organization |
2015-02-11 | House | To Government Organization |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-01-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-20 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2210 (Same As) 2015-02-12 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 16B | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |