WV SB245 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to protection of Chesapeake Bay Watershed
Title
Relating to protection of Chesapeake Bay and Greenbrier River watersheds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 179, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-30 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/23/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-23 | To Governor 3/23/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/23/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-12 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 41) | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 355) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-11 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | With amendment, do pass | |
2011-03-04 | To House Finance | |
2011-03-04 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2011-03-02 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-03-02 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in House | |
2011-03-01 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-01 | Title amendment adopted | |
2011-03-01 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) | |
2011-03-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-01 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-01 | Coming up in deferred order | |
2011-03-01 | Deferred to foot of 2nd reading | |
2011-03-01 | Unanimous consent to amend | |
2011-03-01 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-24 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | |
2011-02-15 | On 2nd reading to Finance | |
2011-02-15 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-15 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-15 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-02-15 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2011-01-24 | To Judiciary | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-01-24 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2011-01-24 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2844 (Same As) 2011-01-25 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22C | 1 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 1 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22 | 18a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22 | 18d | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15A | 17b | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |