WV SB244 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Pending: House Technology and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Pending: House Technology and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Making it unlawful for public utility to prohibit customers from hiring contractors to construct, install, or maintain connections to public utility
Title
Making it unlawful for public utility to prohibit customers from hiring contractors to construct, install, or maintain connections to public utility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-02-24 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/19/21 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-11 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-11 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2090 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |