WV SB244 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 69, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 69, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying conditions for unlawful possession of firearm at school-sponsored activities
Title
Specifying conditions for unlawful possession of firearm at school-sponsored activities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 524) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 470) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 442) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 421) (Y: 18 N: 79 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 69) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 470) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 442) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 421) (Y: 18 N: 79 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 69) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 69, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 524) |
2018-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 470) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 442) |
2018-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 421) |
2018-03-08 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee amendment withdrawn (Voice) |
2018-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | House | To House Education |
2018-02-07 | House | To Education then Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 69) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Amended on 3rd reading (Voice vote) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Unanimous consent to amend |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/5/18 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | Senate | To Education |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-11 | Senate | To Education then Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4139 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - To House Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 7 | 11a | Amended Code | Citation Text |