WV SB243 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring racetrack participate in WV Thoroughbred Development Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring racetrack participate in WV Thoroughbred Development Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 39) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseTo House Finance
2019-01-31HouseTo Finance
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-30SenateOrdered to House
2019-01-30SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 39)
2019-01-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-01-30SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-01-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-01-29SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-28SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-28SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-25SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-10SenateTo Finance
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-10SenateTo Finance
2019-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2922A10bAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback