WV SB240 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-26 - Reported in Com. Sub. for S. B. 237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-26 - Reported in Com. Sub. for S. B. 237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tax Department rule relating to municipal sales and service and use tax administration
Title
Tax Department rule relating to municipal sales and service and use tax administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reported in Com. Sub. for S. B. 237 |
2018-01-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-11 | Senate | To Finance then Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4105 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |