WV SB220 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for the creation of the Kratom Consumer Protection Act. The bill regulates the preparation, distribution, and sale of kratom products. The bill prohibits the preparation, distribution, and sale of adulterated or contaminated kratom products. The bill prescribes fines and penalties. Finally, the bill provides for the powers and duties of certain state governmental officers and entities.
Title
Industrial Hemp Development Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Mike Stuart [R] |
Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 578) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 641) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 341) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 641) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 341) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 578) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 641) |
2023-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2023-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-03-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-03-02 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 341) |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 1st reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 2nd reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-01-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 12E | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12F | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12F | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12F | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12F | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12F | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12F | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12F | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12F | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12F | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12F | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12F | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12F | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 10 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 10 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |