WV SB212 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to remove the Division of Motor Vehicles from the administration of license suspension and revocation in cases where an individual is charged with driving under the influence. Broadly, the bill transfers all decision-making concerning the suspension, revocation and/or reinstatement of an individual’s driver’s license to the courts. The courts then make determinations concerning a driver’s license in accordance with certain procedures, and all within the context of the criminal action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating generally to procedures for drivers' license suspensions and revocations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 100) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 100) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14HouseTo House Judiciary
2017-03-14HouseTo Judiciary
2017-03-14HouseIntroduced in House
2017-03-13SenateOrdered to House
2017-03-13SenateEffective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 100)
2017-03-13SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 100)
2017-03-13SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-13SenateOn 3rd reading
2017-03-11SenateFloor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2017-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-11SenateOn 2nd reading
2017-03-10SenateRead 1st time
2017-03-10SenateOn 1st reading
2017-03-09SenateCommittee substitute reported
2017-02-09SenateTo Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-02-09SenateTo Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17C193Amended CodeCitation Text
17C52Amended CodeCitation Text
17C52bAmended CodeCitation Text
17C54Amended CodeCitation Text
17C57Amended CodeCitation Text
17C5A1Amended CodeCitation Text
17C5A1aAmended CodeCitation Text
17C5A1bNew CodeSee Bill Text
17C5A1cNew CodeSee Bill Text
17C5A3Amended CodeCitation Text
17C5C6New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback