WV SB206 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 52, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 52, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to expand the definition of kidnapping to including taking or gaining custody of, confining or concealing another person by force or threat of force; or by duress, fraud, deceit misrepresentation or enticement.
Title
Relating generally to criminal offense of kidnapping
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 318) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 295) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 80) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 295) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 80) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 52, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 |
2017-04-07 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | Senate | To Governor 4/6/17 |
2017-04-03 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 318) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 295) |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-31 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-30 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 80) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 2 | 14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |