WV SB2020 | 2021 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Chapter 1, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Chapter 1, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Altering time frame retail liquor licensees may sell liquors
Title
Altering time frame retail liquor licensees may sell liquors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - Effective date rejected (Roll No. 737) (Y: 60 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 736) (Y: 59 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 735) (Y: 74 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate rejects special effective date (Roll No. 53) (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 52) (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 51) (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 736) (Y: 59 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 735) (Y: 74 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate rejects special effective date (Roll No. 53) (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 52) (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 51) (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Chapter 1, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2021 |
2021-06-24 | House | Approved by Governor 6/28/21 - House Journal |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/28/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/28/21 |
2021-06-24 | House | To Governor 6/25/21 - House Journal |
2021-06-24 | Senate | To Governor 6/25/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-06-25 | Senate | To Governor 6/25/21 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-06-24 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-06-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-06-24 | House | Effective date rejected (Roll No. 737) |
2021-06-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 736) |
2021-06-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-06-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-06-24 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 735) |
2021-06-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-06-24 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-06-24 | House | Reference dispensed |
2021-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate rejects special effective date (Roll No. 53) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 52) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 51) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-06-24 | Senate | To Rules |
2021-06-24 | Senate | To Rules |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 3A | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |