WV SB2012 | 2021 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Chapter 11, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Chapter 11, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Making supplemental appropriation to DHS, Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation and Division of Administrative Services
Title
Making supplemental appropriation to DHS, Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation and Division of Administrative Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 716) (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 715) (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 714) (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 44) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 44) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 43) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 715) (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 714) (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 44) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 44) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 43) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Chapter 11, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2021 |
2021-06-24 | House | Approved by Governor 6/28/21 - House Journal |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/28/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/28/21 |
2021-06-24 | House | To Governor 6/25/21 - House Journal |
2021-06-24 | Senate | To Governor 6/25/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-06-25 | Senate | To Governor 6/25/21 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-06-24 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-06-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-06-24 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 716) |
2021-06-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 715) |
2021-06-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-06-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-06-24 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 714) |
2021-06-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-06-24 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-06-24 | House | Reference dispensed |
2021-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 44) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 44) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 43) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-06-24 | Senate | To Rules |
2021-06-24 | Senate | To Rules |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |