WV SB201 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 188, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 188, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for the termination of retirement benefits in any and all plans of a member who renders less than honorable service, to add the definition of "former participant", and to provide for the retention of employer contributions in the plan of members of the Teachers' Defined Contribution Retirement System whose benefits have been terminated for less than honorable service.
Title
Providing terms for certain public retirement benefits disqualification
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Foster [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 188, Acts, Regular Session, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/28/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/28/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-28 | Approved by Governor 3/28/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/21/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-21 | To Governor 3/21/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/21/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-08 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 2) | |
2008-03-06 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-06 | Passed House (Roll No. 337) | |
2008-03-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-06 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-05 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-04 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-04 | With amendment, do pass | |
2008-02-28 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-28 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-20 | To House Pensions and Retirement | |
2008-02-20 | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance | |
2008-02-20 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-19 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-19 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) | |
2008-02-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-19 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-18 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-15 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-15 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-14 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | |
2008-01-17 | To Finance | |
2008-01-17 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2008-01-10 | To Pensions | |
2008-01-10 | To Pensions then Finance | |
2008-01-10 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-10 | To Pensions then Finance | |
2008-01-10 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4044 (Same As) 2010-02-12 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=201&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |