WV SB2002 | 2017 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-24 - Chapter 6, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-24 - Chapter 6, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow the Tax Commissioner to share with the Commissioner of Highways certain tax information pertaining to persons who have contracts with the Division of Highways for road construction or repair projects, including their subcontractors, and to persons who submit bids for road construction or repair contracts.
Title
Allowing certain tax information be shared with designated DOH employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-17 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 698) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 697) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 685) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 684) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 683) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 1) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 697) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 685) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 684) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 683) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 1) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-24 | Senate | Chapter 6, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2017 |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 10/24/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 10/24/17 |
2017-11-13 | Senate | To Governor 10/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-10-20 | Senate | To Governor 10/20/17 |
2017-10-17 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-10-17 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-10-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-10-17 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 698) |
2017-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 697) |
2017-10-17 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 3) |
2017-10-17 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-10-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-10-16 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 685) |
2017-10-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 684) |
2017-10-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-10-16 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-10-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-10-16 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 683) |
2017-10-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-10-16 | House | Immediate consideration |
2017-10-16 | House | Reference dispensed |
2017-10-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 1) |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB202 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 10 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 10 | 5cc | New Code | See Bill Text |