WV SB183 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit diesel powered motor vehicles from excessive idling; to define terms; to place restrictions on idling; to provide exceptions to idling restrictions; to establish a misdemeanor offense of excessive idling; to provide criminal penalties; and to provide enforcement by the Department of Environmental Protection.
Title
Creating Diesel-Powered Motor Vehicle Idling Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 137, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-01 | To Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 52) | |
2010-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 319) | |
2010-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-12 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-03-05 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-03-05 | Do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | To House Roads and Transportation | |
2010-03-04 | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-03 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-03 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-01 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-01 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-01 | Reported do pass | |
2010-02-19 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-19 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2010-01-13 | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-13 | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 13A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 13A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 13A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 13A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 13A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 13A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 13A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 13A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 13A | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=183&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |