WV SB18 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 68, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 68, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to crimes committed on State Capitol Complex
Title
Relating to crimes committed on State Capitol Complex
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 131) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 130) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 130) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 68, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Approved by Governor 2/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/25/19 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Governor 2/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-19 | Senate | To Governor 2/19/19 |
2019-02-19 | House | To Governor 2/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 131) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 130) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2092 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 6 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |