WV SB173 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create an exemption for autocycles which are enclosed motorcycles that are equipped with safety belts, airbags, a roll bar, a windshield, wipers, a steering wheel and equipment otherwise required on a motorcycle, and which have no more than three wheels in contact with the roadway at any one time. A person may operate an autocycle with a valid driver's license and is exempt from the motorcycle examination, licensing and endorsement requirements set forth in article two, chapter seventeen-b of this code. The bill would also exempt autocycles from helmet and certain other safety requirements set forth in §17C-15-44. The bill also removes obsolete language.
Title
Relating generally to autocycles
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 330) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 320) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 307) (Y: 24 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 83) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 320) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 307) (Y: 24 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 83) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/18/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/18/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/18/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/10/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/10/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/10/17 |
2017-04-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 330) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-03 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 320) |
2017-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-01 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-01 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2017-04-01 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 307) |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-31 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | House | Do pass with title amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2017-03-13 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2017-03-13 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 83) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/8/17 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2017-02-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2530 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - To House Roads and Transportation
HB2576 (Similar To) 2017-03-08 - To House Judiciary
HB2576 (Similar To) 2017-03-08 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17B | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 2 | 7b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 1 | 69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 15 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |