WV SB169 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow physician assistants to own a practice. This bill also allows the West Virginia Board of Medicine to deny a license or other authorization to physician assistants who make unlawful referrals where that physician assistant has a proprietary interest. It provides that the term "physician assistant" is synonymous with
Title
Allowing physician assistants to own practice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 25) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-15 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-15 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 25) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31B | 13 | 1301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |