WV SB166 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 120, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 120, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Updating contested elections procedures
Title
Updating contested elections procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Effective January 1, 2025 (Roll No. 464) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Effective January 1, 2025 (Roll No. 541) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 540) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 23) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Effective January 1, 2025 (Roll No. 541) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 540) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 23) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 120, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/12/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Effective January 1, 2025 (Roll No. 464) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House changed effective date |
2024-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Effective January 1, 2025 (Roll No. 541) |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 540) |
2024-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2024-01-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-15 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 23) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 7 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |