WV SB160 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Updating language and increasing penalties for indecent exposure
Title
Updating language and increasing penalties for indecent exposure
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] |
Sen. Chandler Swope [R] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] | Sen. Mike Stuart [R] |
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2024-03-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2024-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/7/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/6/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-01-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-15 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 8 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |