WV SB146 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB146

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 84, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Correcting technical error within Solid Waste Management Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correcting technical error within Solid Waste Management Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 281) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 280) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 15) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 84, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-20SenateApproved by Governor 3/20/18
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/9/18 - House Journal
2018-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/9/18
2018-03-03SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-02HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-02HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-02HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 281)
2018-03-02HousePassed House (Roll No. 280)
2018-03-02HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-01HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-01HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-28HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-28HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-27HouseDo pass
2018-01-24HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-01-24HouseTo Judiciary
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-23SenateOrdered to House
2018-01-23SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 15)
2018-01-23SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 15)
2018-01-23SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-23SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-01-22SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-22SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-01-19SenateRead 1st time
2018-01-19SenateOn 1st reading
2018-01-19SenateCommittee substitute reported
2018-01-10SenateTo Judiciary
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-01-10SenateTo Judiciary
2018-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB146 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Reported in Com. Sub. for S. B. 127

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221510Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback