WV SB144 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 82, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 82, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating misdemeanor penalty for making materially false statement in course of misdemeanor investigation
Title
Creating misdemeanor penalty for making materially false statement in course of misdemeanor investigation
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 475) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 447) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 447) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 82, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/17/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/20 |
2020-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 475) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 447) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-01-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 5 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |