WV SB143 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-13 - Recommitted to Finance on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-13 - Recommitted to Finance on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Bill
Title
Budget Bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-13 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance on 3rd reading |
2013-04-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-02-13 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2014 (Same As) 2013-05-15 - Chapter 4, Acts, 2013
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 1 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |