WV SB13 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Approved by Governor 3/7/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Changing distribution of racetrack video lottery net terminal income, excess net terminal income, and excess lottery fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to distributions from State Excess Lottery Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 191) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 253) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 242) (Y: 19 N: 78 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 113) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08HouseApproved by Governor 3/7/19 - House Journal
2019-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/7/19
2019-03-01HouseTo Governor 3/1/19 - House Journal
2019-03-01SenateTo Governor 3/1/19
2019-02-25HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-02-23SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-02-23SenateCommunicated to House
2019-02-23SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 191)
2019-02-23SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-22HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-22HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-22HousePassed House (Roll No. 253)
2019-02-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-22HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-21HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 242)
2019-02-21HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-21HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-20HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-20HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-19HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-13HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-13HouseTo Finance
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-12SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 113)
2019-02-12SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-12SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-11SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-11SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-08SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 2/8/19
2019-02-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-07SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-07SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-06SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-09SenateTo Finance
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateTo Finance
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
292218aAmended CodeCitation Text
2922A10dAmended CodeCitation Text
2922A10eAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=13&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB13%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=13
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB13%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=13
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB13%20SUB1%20ENG.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=13
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB13%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=13
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-12-0113.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00242.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00253.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-23-0191.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback