WV SB118 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - To House Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - To House Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for the issuance of special license plates stating I Support Veterans.
Title
Creating I Support Veterans license plate and license plate for fallen law-enforcement officers next-of-kin
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2013-04-04 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Finance |
2013-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment adopted on 3rd reading (Voice vote) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Unanimous consent to amend |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/2/13 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-13 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |