WV SB118 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require parental consent for minors to use a tanning device.
Title
Requiring parental consent for minors using tanning device
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | To Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-03 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-03 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-01 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-26 | Reported do pass | |
2010-01-13 | To Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | To Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-13 | To Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 43 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 43 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=118&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |