WV SB116 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing number of limited video lottery terminals allowed at retail location
Title
Increasing number of limited video lottery terminals allowed at retail location
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 201) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-29 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2016-02-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 201) |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Finance on 2nd reading |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Motion |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/10/16 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4523 (Similar To) 2016-02-12 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22B | 1101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22B | 1408 | Amended Code | Citation Text |