WV SB110 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB110

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 208, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring certain licensees notify law enforcement or EMS of life-threatening emergency on premises

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring certain licensees notify law enforcement or EMS of life-threatening emergency on premises

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 349) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 311) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 208, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-20SenateApproved by Governor 3/20/18
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/9/18 - House Journal
2018-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/9/18
2018-03-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-06SenateCompleted legislative action
2018-03-06SenateCommunicated to House
2018-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 349)
2018-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-05HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 311)
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-03HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-03HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-02HouseRead 1st time
2018-03-02HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-01HouseWith amendment, do pass
2018-01-23HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-01-23HouseTo Judiciary
2018-01-23HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-22SenateOrdered to House
2018-01-22SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 11)
2018-01-22SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-22SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-01-19SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-19SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-01-18SenateRead 1st time
2018-01-18SenateOn 1st reading
2018-01-17SenateCommittee substitute reported
2018-01-10SenateTo Judiciary
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-01-10SenateTo Judiciary
2018-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB110 (Carry Over) 2017-02-21 - Reported in Com. Sub. for S. B. 113

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60713Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback