WV SB110 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 20, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 20, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to expand the charge of the Broadband Deployment Council to compel the study and promotion of the use of electronic, Internet, and virtual instruction on student learning, career readiness, workforce preparation and alternative career training; and to compel the council to implement e-instruction and distance education services by 2014.
Title
Relating to Broadband Deployment Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 35) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 415) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 415) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 20, Acts, Regular Session, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/12 | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-10 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 35) | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 415) | |
2012-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-10 | Amended on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-10 | Amendment reported by the Clerk | |
2012-03-10 | Placed at foot of bills on third reading | |
2012-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-09 | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/10/12 | |
2012-03-09 | Placed at foot of bills | |
2012-03-09 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-08 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-07 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-06 | With amendment, do pass | |
2012-02-29 | To House Finance | |
2012-02-29 | To Finance | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-28 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-28 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) | |
2012-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-28 | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee | |
2012-02-27 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-24 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-23 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-23 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-22 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | |
2012-01-25 | To Government Organization | |
2012-01-25 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization | |
2012-01-11 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-11 | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Government Organization | |
2012-01-11 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 15C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 15C | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |