WV SB1011 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Chapter 5, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Chapter 5, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing distributions to WV Infrastructure Fund
Title
Reducing distributions to WV Infrastructure Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 708) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 707) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 706) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 22) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-11 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 21) (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 707) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 706) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 22) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-11 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 21) (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | Senate | Chapter 5, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/17/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/17/16 |
2016-06-14 | House | Approved by Governor 6/17/16 - House Journal |
2016-06-14 | Senate | To Governor 6/14/16 |
2016-06-14 | House | To Governor 6/14/16 - House Journal |
2016-06-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-06-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-06-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-06-13 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 708) |
2016-06-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 707) |
2016-06-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-06-13 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 706) |
2016-06-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-06-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-06-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-06-12 | House | Immediate consideration |
2016-06-12 | House | Do pass |
2016-06-11 | House | To House Finance |
2016-06-11 | House | To Finance |
2016-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 22) |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 21) |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22 | 18d | Amended Code | Citation Text |