WV SB1001 | 2024 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Chapter 1, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Chapter 1, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this supplemental appropriation bill is to add and increase items of appropriation in the aforesaid accounts for the designated spending units for expenditure during the fiscal year 2025.
Title
Supplementing and amending appropriations to Department of Health and Department of Human Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 837) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House reconsidered, concurred in Senate amendment, and passed bill (Roll No. 836) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - Motion for previous question on reconsideration adopted (Roll No. 835) (Y: 61 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - Motion to concur in Senate Amendment Rejected (Roll No. 832) (Y: 14 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2024-05-20 - House - House refused to concur and requested Senate to recede (Roll No. 833) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 33) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 808) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 807) (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 806) (Y: 35 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2024-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 805) (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-05-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-19 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 1) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House reconsidered, concurred in Senate amendment, and passed bill (Roll No. 836) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - Motion for previous question on reconsideration adopted (Roll No. 835) (Y: 61 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - Motion to concur in Senate Amendment Rejected (Roll No. 832) (Y: 14 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2024-05-20 - House - House refused to concur and requested Senate to recede (Roll No. 833) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 33) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 808) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 807) (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 806) (Y: 35 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2024-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 805) (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-05-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-19 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 1) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 1, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2024 |
2024-05-21 | House | Approved by Governor 5/24/2024 - House Journal |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/24/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/24/2024 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | To Governor 5/23/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-05-23 | Senate | To Governor 5/23/2024 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-05-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-05-21 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-05-21 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 837) |
2024-05-21 | House | House reconsidered, concurred in Senate amendment, and passed bill (Roll No. 836) |
2024-05-21 | House | Motion for previous question on reconsideration adopted (Roll No. 835) |
2024-05-21 | House | House reconsidered and rejected motion to request Senate to recede |
2024-05-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-05-20 | House | House refused to concur and requested Senate to recede (Roll No. 833) |
2024-05-20 | House | Motion to concur in Senate Amendment Rejected (Roll No. 832) |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 33) |
2024-05-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-05-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-05-20 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 808) |
2024-05-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 807) |
2024-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-05-20 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-05-20 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 806) |
2024-05-20 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-05-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 805) |
2024-05-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-05-20 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-05-20 | House | Reference dispensed |
2024-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-05-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 1) |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB101 (Similar To) 2024-05-21 - On 2nd reading, Special Calendar