WV SB10 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 196, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Unborn Child Protection from Dismemberment Abortion Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Unborn Child Protection from Dismemberment Abortion Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - House - House passed over veto (Roll No. 480) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate passed as result of veto (Roll No. 382) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 230) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 253) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 252) (Y: 16 N: 82 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 122) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-13SenateChapter 196, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
2016-03-11SenateHouse Message received
2016-03-10HouseCompleted legislative action
2016-03-10HouseCommunicated to Senate
2016-03-10HouseHouse passed over veto (Roll No. 480)
2016-03-10HouseMotion to consider notwithstanding the objections of the Governor
2016-03-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2016-03-10SenateSenate requests House to concur
2016-03-10SenateSenate passed as result of veto (Roll No. 382)
2016-03-10SenateSenate reconsidered action (voice vote)
2016-03-10HouseVetoed by Governor 3/9/16 - House Journal
2016-03-10SenateVetoed by Governor 3/9/16 - Senate Journal
2016-03-09SenateVetoed by Governor 3/9/16
2016-03-03SenateTo Governor 3/3/16
2016-03-03HouseTo Governor 3/3/16 - House Journal
2016-02-29SenateCompleted legislative action
2016-02-29SenateCommunicated to House
2016-02-29SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 230)
2016-02-29SenateSenate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote)
2016-02-29SenateHouse Message received
2016-02-29HouseCommunicated to Senate
2016-02-29HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2016-02-29HousePassed House (Roll No. 253)
2016-02-29HouseRead 3rd time
2016-02-29HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 252)
2016-02-29HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2016-02-29HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2016-02-27HouseAmendments pending
2016-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2016-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2016-02-26HouseRead 1st time
2016-02-26HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2016-02-25HouseDo pass
2016-02-23HouseTo House Judiciary
2016-02-23HouseDo pass, but first to Judiciary
2016-02-18HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2016-02-18HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2016-02-18HouseIntroduced in House
2016-02-17SenateOrdered to House
2016-02-17SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 122)
2016-02-17SenateRead 3rd time
2016-02-17SenatePlymale and Stollings Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote)
2016-02-17SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2016-02-16SenateRead 2nd time
2016-02-16SenateOn 2nd reading
2016-02-15SenateRead 1st time
2016-02-15SenateOn 1st reading
2016-02-12Senate2nd reference dispensed
2016-02-12SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2016-01-13SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2016-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate
2016-01-13SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2016-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB4004 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - To House Health and Human Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16201New CodeSee Bill Text
162O1New CodeSee Bill Text
162P1Amended CodeCitation Text
61231New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=10&year=2016&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB10%20intr.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=10
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB10%20SUB1.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=10
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB10%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=10
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB10%20SUB1%20ENR%20OFFICIAL.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=10
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/senate/02-17-0122.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/house/00252.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/house/00253.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/senate/02-29-0230.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/senate/03-10-0382.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/house/00480.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback