WV HCR98 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-11 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-11 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Summary
Recognizing the Mighty Wurlitzer Pipe Organ in the Keith-Albee Theatre as the Official Theatre Pipe Organ in the State
Title
Recognizing the Mighty Wurlitzer Pipe Organ in the Keith-Albee Theatre as the Official Theatre Pipe Organ in the State
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | To Government Organization | |
2011-03-11 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-10 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2011-03-10 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Be adopted | |
2011-02-23 | To House Rules | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-23 | To Rules | |
2011-02-23 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2011&sessiontype=RS&input4=98&billtype=CR&houseorig=H&btype=res |