WV HCR97 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U.S. Army Air Corps Private Albert J. Sutphin Memorial Highway
Title
U.S. Army Air Corps Private Albert J. Sutphin Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-03-10 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2022-03-09 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-09 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Be adopted |
2022-03-04 | House | To House Rules |
2022-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-03-04 | House | To Rules |
2022-03-04 | House | Filed for introduction |