WV HCR79 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the Joint Committee on Government and Finance study state agency websites
Title
Requesting the Joint Committee on Government and Finance study state agency websites
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | To Rules |
2016-03-10 | Senate | To Rules |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2016-03-09 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | Be adopted |
2016-02-20 | House | To House Rules |
2016-02-20 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2016-02-20 | House | Originating in House Government Organization |