WV HCR75 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR75

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Naming the highest peak on Wolf Creek Mountain in Monroe County, Boone’s Peak

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naming the highest peak on Wolf Creek Mountain in Monroe County, Boone’s Peak

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 292) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenateTo Rules
2020-03-04SenateReported be adopted, with amendment, but first to Rules
2020-02-25SenateTo Natural Resources
2020-02-25SenateTo Natural Resources then Rules
2020-02-25SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-24HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-24HouseAdopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 292)
2020-02-24HouseReported by the Clerk
2020-02-24HouseOn Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
2020-02-21HouseBy substitute, be adopted
2020-02-17HouseTo House Rules
2020-02-17HouseWith amendment, be adopted, but first to Rules
2020-02-11HouseTo House Agriculture and Natural Resources
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-11HouseTo Agriculture and Natural Resources then Rules
2020-02-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HCR75 (Carry Over) 2019-02-18 - To House Technology and Infrastructure

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback