WV HCR65 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The "Perry Brothers Memorial Highway"
Title
The "Perry Brothers Memorial Highway"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | House received Senate message | |
2012-02-22 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-02-22 | Communicated to House | |
2012-02-22 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-22 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-02-22 | Reported be adopted | |
2012-02-16 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-16 | House Message received | |
2012-02-15 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-15 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-15 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2012-02-15 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Be adopted | |
2012-02-13 | To House Rules | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-13 | To Rules | |
2012-02-13 | Filed for introduction |