WV HCR63 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The "Dewayne Phillip Morgan Memorial Bridge"
Title
The "Dewayne Phillip Morgan Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | House received Senate message | |
2012-02-27 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-02-27 | Communicated to House | |
2012-02-27 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-27 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-02-27 | Reported be adopted | |
2012-02-22 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-21 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-21 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-21 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2012-02-21 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2012-02-20 | Be adopted | |
2012-02-13 | To House Rules | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-13 | To Rules | |
2012-02-13 | Filed for introduction |