WV HCR2 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
U.S. Army PV2 William Frederick Kump Memorial Bridge
Title
U.S. Army PV2 William Frederick Kump Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Del. Daryl Cowles [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2016-02-16 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2016-02-16 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-16 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-15 | House | Adopted by House, House Calendar (Voice vote) |
2016-02-15 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2016-02-15 | House | On Unfinished Business, House Calendar |
2016-02-12 | House | Be adopted |
2016-02-10 | House | To House Rules |
2016-02-10 | House | By substitute, be adopted, but first to Rules |
2016-01-14 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2016-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-14 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Rules |
2016-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |