WV HCR13 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U.S. Army SSG Brian Curtis Rogers Memorial Bridge
Title
U.S. Army SSG Brian Curtis Rogers Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Del. Martin Atkinson [R] | Del. John Kelly [R] | Del. Guy Ward [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] |
Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. Jim Butler [R] | Del. Danny Hamrick [R] | Del. Jordan Hill [R] |
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Sen. Patrick Martin [R] | Del. Danny Wagner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-03-15 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-15 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2017-03-14 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2017-03-13 | House | Be adopted |
2017-02-15 | House | To House Rules |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-15 | House | To Rules |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |